CUMBRIA - CUMBERLAND FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 228857
Charity reporting is up to date (159 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marion Clarke Trustee 28 March 2020 None on record
Kathleen Bowron Trustee 14 June 2016
NORTH CUMBRIA METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
MARGARET PATTINSON Trustee 24 October 2012 None on record
SANDRA CLIFFORD Trustee 15 April 2016 None on record
Kris Longshaw Trustee 11 April 2017 None on record
Dawn Eyre Trustee 28 March 2020 None on record
Penny Coulthard Trustee 08 January 2019 None on record
Jennifer Baker Trustee 11 April 2017 None on record
Mary Lawson Trustee 08 April 2014 None on record
ILENE FORSYTH Chair 24 October 2012 None on record
Ann Kirkpatrick Trustee 28 March 2020 None on record