KINGSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 229025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.41k £7.26k £6.94k £7.50k £16.11k
Total expenditure £4.50k £9.15k £7.63k £6.75k £14.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A