WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - POLSTEAD

Charity number: 229033
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £1.87k £2.44k £2.28k £1.77k £1.50k
Total expenditure £1.83k £1.85k £2.67k £1.31k £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A