Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HUDDERSFIELD HOSPITALS

Charity number: 229037
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required