Financial history EVAN DAVIES CHARITY

Charity number: 229155
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £854 £850 £1.20k £1.09k £1.07k
Total expenditure £0 £189 £189 £184 £184
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A