NICOLAS STACEY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 229217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 10 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download