BARTS AND THE LONDON ALUMNI ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 229227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time Download