BARTS AND THE LONDON ALUMNI ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 229227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £409.58k £16.58k £24.29k £35.48k £37.17k
Total expenditure £27.30k £20.69k £20.19k £32.07k £33.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A