BARTS AND THE LONDON ALUMNI ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 229227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Stephanie Dowker Trustee 20 October 2014 None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER MERCER Trustee 20 October 2015 None on record
Dr PETER MILLS Trustee 20 October 2014 None on record
PROFESSOR BRIAN TREVOR COLVIN Trustee
THE GRIFFIN COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
Dr Andrew James Hobkirk Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
Dr Thomas Dolphin Trustee 18 October 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR GERALD LIBBY FRCPSYCH Trustee 21 October 2014 None on record
MR DAVID MACLEAN Trustee None on record