Trustees THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 229229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Gillespie OBE Chair 01 January 2023
None on record
Captain Julian Despres Trustee 12 September 2023
None on record
Professor Laura Serrant OBE Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Sumeshni Tranka Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Professor Jacqueline Reilly Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Charlotte Vitty Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Professor James Buchan Trustee 22 March 2022
None on record
Anthony Carey Trustee 14 December 2021
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OPHTHALMOLOGISTS
Received: On time
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF RADIOLOGISTS
Received: On time
Dr Dale Spence Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
DAVID BENTON Trustee 04 August 2021
None on record
Ben Edwards Trustee 15 December 2020
None on record
Dame Professor JILL LINDA MACLEOD CLARK Trustee 13 June 2017
None on record