Accounts and annual returns THE TYNE MARINERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 229236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window