Financial history MEDICAL MISSIONARY NEWS FUND

Charity number: 229296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.09m £1.05m £764.71k £624.26k £742.51k
Total expenditure £1.18m £1.17m £1.07m £616.17k £701.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.07m £1.04m £469.70k £621.47k £734.97k
Income - Other trading activities £5.81k £6.82k £0 £678 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £286.64k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.39k £6.41k £2.80k £2.07k £3.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £5.57k £0 £4.08k
Income - Legacies £358.23k £348.97k £188.10k £110.94k £196.71k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.16m £900.18k £454.49k £554.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.68k £4.34k £13.38k £15.16k £16.04k
Expenditure - Governance £4.12k £3.92k £4.31k £0 £4.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £534.93k £516.65k £876.89k £162.80k £253.24k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £159.87k £146.52k £131.83k