Trustees MEDICAL MISSIONARY NEWS FUND
Charity number: 229296

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID KEITH | Chair | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Connell | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Samuel Phillips | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Macnaughtan | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Proud | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Christine Sansom | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASON FREEMAN | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR RAYMOND ALLEN | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gill | Trustee | 08 November 2006 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.