Financial history INTERNATIONAL PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION

Charity number: 229476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £95.88m £78.75m £83.53m £131.09m £121.52m
Total expenditure £91.06m £71.59m £85.49m £129.22m £116.71m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £47.50m N/A
Income from government grants £8.58m £0 £6.23m £47.50m £55.30m
Income - Donations and legacies £95.12m £76.96m £82.81m £0 £324.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.22m £97.02k £56.05k £175.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £130.60k £130.05m £120.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £494.12k £383.85k £489.55k £418.74k £167.00k
Income - Other £261.03k £186.92k £0 £559.65k £497.00k
Income - Legacies £2.94m £497.69k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £87.10m £67.44m £82.16m £125.82m £114.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.80m £3.83m £3.02m £3.18m £2.52m
Expenditure - Governance £331.62k £315.61k £493.40k £0 £1.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £50.23m £39.44m £50.15m £0 £84.71m
Expenditure - Investment management £44.85k £3.85k £3.73k £0 £3.00k
Expenditure - Other £164.71k £313.85k £306.72k £212.17k £0