Financial history THE BRITISH PSYCHOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 229642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.68m £13.54m £12.78m £12.96m £10.84m
Total expenditure £11.86m £12.54m £13.15m £16.51m £14.01m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £438.00k £489.00k £465.00k £386.00k £322.00k
Income - Charitable activities £11.90m £12.61m £11.86m £12.15m £9.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £348.00k £439.00k £455.00k £427.00k £42.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.46m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.47m £12.09m £9.61m £11.25m £11.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £384.00k £443.00k £2.78m £3.20m £324.00k
Expenditure - Governance £1.44m £529.00k £573.74k £629.00k £549.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £49.00k £76.00k £61.00k £58.00k £16.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £763.00k £2.06m £2.23m