Trustees THE BRITISH PSYCHOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 229642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Faulconbridge Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Dr Peter Branney Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Dr Nicky Hayes Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Katherine Carpenter Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Professor Andrew Tolmie Trustee 18 June 2021
None on record
Professor Niamh Stack Trustee 07 May 2021
None on record
Prof. Carol McGuinness Trustee 30 April 2020
None on record
Christina Louise Buxton Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
Dr Roxane Lisaann Gervais Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
Dr Adam James Jowett Trustee 19 July 2019
None on record
Alison Clarke Trustee 03 May 2017
None on record