Financial history AGE CONCERN ST ALBANS

Charity number: 229773
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £49.50k £49.50k £82.92k £31.96k £24.65k
Total expenditure £56.75k £56.75k £92.63k £38.37k £37.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A