Trustees WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - EVERTON AND LYMORE
Charity number: 229795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERLY FILLMORE | Chair | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH COLVIN | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BORDER | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENISE GIBB | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAY EDGEWORTH | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE COMPTON BENNETT | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LUSH | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth ROSE | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Tyler | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Odbert | Trustee | 19 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Clark | Trustee | 19 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN RAMSAY | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.