Trustees SALISBURY AND DISTRICT NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity Number: 229833

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gordon Thompson | Chair | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Pearl Ashton | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Paige Scott | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Thomas Elsworth | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Gratwick | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Royle | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Hardingham | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Lea | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr JAMES NEIL MACPHERSON | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MUGGLETON | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.