Financial history THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 229907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £263.11k £268.69k £284.65k £292.88k £203.50k
Total expenditure £362.14k £354.75k £335.57k £423.91k £338.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A