WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - DUNWICH

Charity Number: 229953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Womens Institute providing education and a social meeting place for local women

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £2,423
Total expenditure: £2,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Jane Haxby Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Foster Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Heather Rundle Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record
Angela Abell Trustee 08 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.88k £1.61k £1.90k £2.07k £2.42k
Total expenditure £1.26k £1.12k £2.65k £2.18k £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MAYPOLE COTTAGE
HIGH STREET
DUNWICH
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 3DP
Phone:
01728648434
Website:

No information available