Financial history CARR'S COTTAGE AND CARR'S BETHEL

Charity number: 230009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.63k £2.80k £2.89k £2.99k £2.85k
Total expenditure £855 £972 £936 £4.18k £770
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A