Accounts and annual returns THE ENGLISH BENEDICTINE ORDER OF OULTON ABBEY NEAR STONE, STAFFS

Charity number: 230096
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window