Financial history THE ENGLISH BENEDICTINE ORDER OF OULTON ABBEY NEAR STONE, STAFFS

Charity number: 230096
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.83m £2.32m £2.26m £2.77m £2.49m
Total expenditure £1.89m £2.29m £2.35m £2.46m £2.55m
Income from government contracts £921.58k £1.70m £1.68m £1.73m £606.84k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £93.15k
Income - Donations and legacies £24.03k £28.63k £10.73k £14.30k £4.15k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £2.44k £0 £0 £267
Income - Charitable activities £1.77m £2.27m £2.22m £2.48m £2.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £14.30k £0
Income - Investment £28.98k £26.11k £23.34k £29.61k £34.83k
Income - Other £3.33k £0 £2.98k £245.08k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £2.29m £2.35m £2.46m £2.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £2.24k £2.36k £1.70k £4.20k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £26.09k £19.65k £54.18k £6.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £2.24k £2.36k £1.70k £0
Expenditure - Other £5.12k £0 £0 £0 £0