Trustees THE HENRY SMITH CHARITY

Charity number: 230102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Sieghart Trustee 12 March 2023
None on record
Ben Kernighan Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Baldeesh Nahl Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Janet Garrill Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Andrew Beeforth Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Abureza Faisel Rahman Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
George Roberts Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Jonathan Asquith Trustee 10 December 2019
None on record
Emma Davies Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
Christopher Mark Granger Trustee 13 March 2019
OUNDELIAN MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
The Lady Bella Colgrain DL Trustee 27 November 2014
None on record