Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - GREAT ECCLESTON

Charity number: 230241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £10.79k £11.47k £14.02k £8.76k £16.17k
Total expenditure £11.97k £11.78k £7.76k £8.42k £7.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A