FRIENDS OF THE SOUTH DOWNS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object for which the Society is established is the preservation of the beauty and amenities of the South Downs for the public benefit. The Society works through its many volunteers and skilled professional staff, guided by its trustees who are elected by the membership, to achieve its objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 October 1963: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE SOUTH DOWNS (Working name)
- SOCIETY OF SUSSEX DOWNSMEN (Previous name)
- SOCIETY OF SUSSEX DOWNSMEN LIMITED (Previous name)
- SOUTH DOWNS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sawyer | Chair | 06 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANTHONY MALCOLM WHITBREAD | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Henrietta Lacey-Gutsell | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Paul Martin Gilchrist | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Small | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Goody | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wilkinson | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Gordon Green | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Sutcliffe Haworth | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FRANCES LOVETT | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.38k | £89.71k | £107.65k | £229.01k | £141.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.59k | £98.64k | £124.78k | £81.28k | £169.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSCN INCORPORATED 10/10/1936 & 20/05/1982 & CERT. OF INC'N ON CHANGE OF NAME 03/05/2005 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS 1/10/1983, 20/06/1984 & 23/04/2005, NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY RESOLUTION 01/05/2010 REG. AT CO. HOUSE 28/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 MAY 2017 as amended on 07 Nov 2020 as amended on 07 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE BEAUTY AND AMENITIES OF THE SOUTH DOWNS IN AND WITHIN THE VICINITY OF THE SOUTH DOWNS NATIONAL PARK
Area of benefit
IN AND WITHIN THE VICINITY OF THE SOUTH DOWNS NATIONAL PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Swan Court
Station Road
Pulborough
West Sussex
RH20 1RL
- Phone:
- 01798875073
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window