Accounts and annual returns ST KATHERINE'S CHAPEL ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 230386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2021 728 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2021 1093 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required