Financial history ST KATHERINE'S CHAPEL ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 230386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.08k £5.40k £10.68k £5.40k £4.84k
Total expenditure £3.46k £7.30k £3.16k £14.74k £4.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A