Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 230417
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window