Financial history ST JOHN'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 230417
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £49.55k £48.63k £47.23k £49.90k £50.41k
Total expenditure £26.39k £25.63k £24.83k £23.77k £23.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A