Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM JONES'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 230514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window