Dogfen lywodraethu WILLIAM JONES'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 12/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 NOV 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO: A) ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND B) HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL DECIDE.
Maes buddion
MONMOUTH IN THE COUNTY OF MONMOUTHSHIRE AND THE ANCIENT PARISH OF NEWLAND IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.