ASTLEY AND ARELEY KINGS SICK FUND

Charity number: 230709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 04/04/2016 05/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020
Total gross income £1.29k £1.49k £1.51k £2.20k £1.57k
Total expenditure £6.11k £5.00k £3.99k £1.42k £660
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A