DARSHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for local clubs, groups & others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 September 1963: Standard registration
- DARSHAM VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- DARSHAM VILLAGEHALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jayne Robinson | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Clare Ling | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WILLIAM ROBINSON | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
RONALD CHARLES CLARK | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALAN HOLLAND | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annie Mcphail | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ballantine | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jill Edwards | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SHIPP | Trustee | 12 March 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.62k | £8.09k | £18.48k | £19.70k | £22.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.65k | £8.41k | £23.47k | £26.07k | £24.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £64 | £100 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13/10/1953 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/05/2013 as amended on 08 Jul 2024 as amended on 15 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DARSHAM AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Darsham Village Hall
Cheyney Green
Darsham
SAXMUNDHAM
Suffolk
IP17 3FA
- Phone:
- 07583561573
- Email:
- info@darshamvillagehall.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window