Accounts and annual returns WORKING MEN'S READING ROOM

Charity number: 230755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 June 2024 13 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2024 13 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 June 2023 24 November 2024 225 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2023 24 November 2024 225 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 June 2022 24 November 2024 591 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2022 24 November 2024 591 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 June 2021 22 November 2024 954 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2021 22 November 2024 954 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 June 2020 15 May 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 June 2020 15 May 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window