WINWICK OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 230874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required