Financial history ST MARGARET'S AND STONE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 231021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £136.89k £145.28k £215.09k £174.29k £166.50k
Total expenditure £80.10k £197.62k £182.27k £200.94k £148.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £971 N/A N/A N/A N/A