CATHOLIC CONCERN FOR ANIMALS

Charity number: 231022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £48.20k £17.80k £12.33k £163.71k £35.16k
Total expenditure £57.60k £72.47k £75.25k £74.62k £95.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A