THE ENGLISH PROVINCE OF THE ORDER OF PREACHERS

Charity number: 231192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.33m £6.29m £4.73m £3.66m £3.23m
Total expenditure £2.71m £2.76m £2.91m £3.16m £3.15m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.62m £4.53m £2.84m £1.95m £1.73m
Income - Other trading activities £207.55k £204.02k £259.54k £115.25k £49.60k
Income - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.05m £993.66k £920.65k £815.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £430.65k £498.26k £637.69k £664.74k £633.50k
Income - Other £15.71k £10.12k £4.54k £7.81k £4.96k
Income - Legacies £88.81k £3.11m £545.56k £646.90k £638.71k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.54m £2.59m £2.69m £2.95m £2.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £169.29k £175.24k £210.66k £217.60k £192.70k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £36.06k £59.95k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £81.03k £80.58k £123.12k £122.88k £87.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0