DOMINICAN SISTERS OF THE CONGREGATION OF ST CATHERINE OF SIENA SITUATED AT STOKE GOLDING (THIRD ORDER - KING WILLIAMSTOWN CONG)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the religious and other charitable works carried out by the sisters whilst also supporting the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 May 1964: Standard registration
- 20 February 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 30/06/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.43k | £15.17k | £14.92k | £15.35k | £21.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.66k | £11.67k | £16.15k | £13.97k | £156.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST MARCH 1962
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND THE MAINTENANCE OF CONVENTS AND HOUSES, AND THE UPKEEP AND TRAINING OF THE SISTERS FOR THIS PURPOSE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window