ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 231239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.56m £5.53m £6.01m £5.80m £7.34m
Total expenditure £5.68m £5.70m £6.08m £6.44m £7.56m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.01m £5.01m £5.04m £5.18m £6.77m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £58.16k £57.78k £30.47k £18.83k £19.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £209.92k £87.13k £600
Income - Investment £446.46k £468.67k £684.76k £593.71k £503.19k
Income - Other £42.89k £16.42k £463.98k £90.98k £46.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £24.94k £0 £192.28k £8.58k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.42m £5.33m £5.71m £6.40m £7.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £46.91k £32.78k £40.71k £41.97k £38.60k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £54.57k £56.03k £62.42k £44.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £102.48k £147.08k £0 £129.49k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £20.20k £30.37k £41.97k £38.60k
Expenditure - Other £207.98k £342.81k £329.44k £0 £142.18k