RELIGIOUS SISTERS OF CHARITY

Charity number: 231323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £966.56k £862.67k £1.33m £945.20k £812.11k
Total expenditure £1.84m £1.29m £1.08m £2.05m £1.86m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £560.91k £453.30k £414.92k £531.72k £388.07k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £405.65k £405.50k £409.16k £412.34k £417.14k
Income - Other £0 £3.87k £507.65k £1.15k £6.90k
Income - Legacies £63.00k £16.29k £191 £131.78k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.29m £1.08m £2.05m £1.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £29.26k £35.23k £66.49k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £410 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £163.90k £0 £0 £0 £0