ROYAL HUMANE SOCIETY

Charity number: 231469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time Download