Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - CHELMSFORD BRANCH

Charity number: 231521
Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required