The Royal Air Forces Association - Eastbourne & Hailsham Branch

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the welfare by charitable means of those who are serving or who have served in Our Air Forces, their wives and dependants of those who died either while serving in Our Air Forces or thereafter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 04 December 1963: Standard registration
- 27 July 2021: Funds received from 1071224 ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION SEAHAVEN BRANCH
- R A F A (Working name)
- THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - EASTBOURNE BRANCH (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Frank Blunden | Chair | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Scott | Trustee | 02 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Adams | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DAVID TUCKER | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Collins | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.48k | £5.83k | £29.89k | £18.15k | £5.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.87k | £94.16k | £16.81k | £21.22k | £3.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686 as amended on 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
EASTBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Fern Close
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN23 8AQ
- Phone:
- 07723518552
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window