THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - STOCKTON AND THORNABY BRANCH

Charity number: 231601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required