Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - STOCKTON AND THORNABY BRANCH

Charity number: 231601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.12k £412 £0 £9.69k £8.83k
Total expenditure £4.33k £254 £0 £1.09k £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A