Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - LLANGOLLEN BRANCH

Charity number: 231614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.33k £6.62k £6.58k £35.90k £4.69k
Total expenditure £5.32k £4.10k £5.16k £35.58k £3.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A