Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - SWANSEA AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 231615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required